U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-mj-01028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alston
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 24, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 23, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 20, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 20, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.