U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McAllister
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 06, 2023: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 06, 2023: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 06, 2023: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.