U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FANNING
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Motions Referred]
  • January 17, 2023: [Motion for Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Waiver-Other]
  • January 17, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 12, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Oral Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arrest]
  • January 09, 2023: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 06, 2023: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.