U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SLIGH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2023: [Motions Referred]
  • January 17, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Indictment]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.