U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Westrup
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 20, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 17, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 17, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 17, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 17, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 11, 2023: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 11, 2023: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 11, 2023: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 11, 2023: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.