U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-ct-03008
  • Case Name: Hemphill v. Bruno et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2025: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 10, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 10, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 09, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document ]
  • April 09, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support]
  • April 09, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Case Submitted]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • January 13, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 13, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • January 13, 2023: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • January 11, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 11, 2023: [Complaint]
  • January 11, 2023: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.