U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zavala
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 25, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 24, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 24, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 24, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 24, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 11, 2023: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 11, 2023: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 11, 2023: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 11, 2023: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.