U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARPENTER, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Case Referred for Screening]
  • May 12, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 12, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • May 12, 2025: [Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence 2255]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Related Case]
  • January 20, 2023: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • January 13, 2023: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 12, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 12, 2023: [Oral Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.