U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RIVERA DE JESUS, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 05, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Violators]
  • April 28, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 17, 2023: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Bond Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2023: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 12, 2023: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Motions Referred]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • January 12, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 12, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Oral Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arrest]
  • January 11, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.