U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carruth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Sentence]
December, 2024
  • December 02, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 13, 2023: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 13, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 13, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.