U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOYE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • January 19, 2023: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 13, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 13, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2023: [Oral Motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [Arrest]
  • January 12, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.