U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAGE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [SEALED Attachments to Order Re: AO247]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence re 2023 Criminal History Retroactive Amendment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 01, 2025: [SEALED Response to Statement of Position on Eligibility]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • January 12, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 12, 2023: [Oral Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.