U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Deaver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2023: [Seal]
  • January 18, 2023: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 13, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 13, 2023: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.