U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00347-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Neppalli
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 20, 2023: [Protective Order ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Unseal Case]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.