U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brasser et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice Regarding Passport]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Report to BOP]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to Report to BOP]
  • April 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Case Number - USCA]
  • March 24, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • March 14, 2025: [Case Number - USCA]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • March 13, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • March 11, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2023: [Summons Issued]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2023: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.