U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-ct-03020
  • Case Name: Parsons v. Sullivan et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion No Longer Submitted]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Case Submitted]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • January 20, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 20, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • January 20, 2023: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 19, 2023: [Complaint]
  • January 19, 2023: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.