U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-ct-03018
  • Case Name: Pridgen v. Judge et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Protective Order]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 23, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • January 23, 2023: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • January 20, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 19, 2023: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • January 19, 2023: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.