U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cox
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 04, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 04, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Warrant Issued ]
  • January 25, 2023: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 25, 2023: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 25, 2023: [Warrant Requested]
  • January 25, 2023: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.