U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eure
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Memorandum and Recommendations]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Objection to Memorandum and Recommendations]
  • March 13, 2025: [Objection to Memorandum and Recommendations]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 11, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Referred]
  • October 04, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.