U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Renteria-Rios
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Docket Call]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Referred]
  • October 04, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.