U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 11, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 10, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 10, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Hearing ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Document]
  • October 04, 2024: [Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.