U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00071-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Beltran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [SEALED Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Sequester]
  • March 31, 2025: [Preserve ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Jenks Material]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on SEALED Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • March 14, 2025: [SEALED Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice to Counsel]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice to Counsel]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 05, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Appoint Counsel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.