U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Puddy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 29, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 10, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice to Counsel]
  • October 05, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Reconsideration ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.