U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00247-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Oakley et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 10, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 02, 2025: [USCA Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [USCA Case Number ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 27, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 11, 2025: [Seal ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Stipulation of Facts to Jury]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order of Competency to Stand Trial ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Determine Competency to Stand Trial]
  • March 10, 2025: [Hearing Out of Jury Presence ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Docket Call]
February, 2025
  • February 08, 2025: [Seal Document]
November, 2024
  • November 17, 2024: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Judgment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.