U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00104-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Exum et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Judgment ]
January, 2025
  • January 13, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 04, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.