U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cotten
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 08, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • May 08, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 14, 2025: [RESTRICTED Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 04, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.