U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hinton et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 05, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Seal ]
  • April 29, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Seal ]
  • April 07, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 04, 2024: [Continue Sentencing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.