U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00229-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fuoco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Seal ]
  • April 28, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.