U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00101-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Richards et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • March 19, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
January, 2025
  • January 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 04, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 04, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.