U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00119-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Arias et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Text Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 04, 2025: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Seal ]
  • October 04, 2024: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.