U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00257-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kornegay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • February 18, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 04, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.