U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00282-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Judgment ]
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 04, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.