U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-ct-03036
  • Case Name: Pittman v. Ohno
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 22, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • May 22, 2025: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • May 22, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • May 22, 2025: [Notice of Correction]
  • May 21, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 21, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • May 21, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit]
  • May 21, 2025: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • May 21, 2025: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • May 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 21, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 04, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 04, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.