U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00044-7
  • Case Name: USA v. Wiggins, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 30, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 28, 2025: [Discovery ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motion Referred]
  • April 09, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Judgment ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 11, 2025: [Docket Call]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 08, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.