U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment ]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.