U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00290-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Figuereo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2024: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Text Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 04, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Arrest ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.