U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-ct-03216
  • Case Name: Singleton v. Hawkins et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 21, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 15, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 14, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Case Submitted]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 08, 2024: [Motion Referred]
  • October 04, 2024: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.