U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cr-00200-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Weeks, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2024: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 09, 2024: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Motion Referred]
  • October 08, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Motion Referred]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.