U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-mj-01099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nutter
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 27, 2025: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Probation]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea and Sentence ]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 10, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 10, 2024: [Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Bond ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.