U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-ct-03180
  • Case Name: Vigniero v. Leggett et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Text Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 23, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 17, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice-other]
  • October 04, 2024: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 04, 2024: [Summons Issued]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice-other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.