U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lowery
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • May 06, 2025: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
  • May 06, 2025: [Departure - Sentencing Guidelines]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 09, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 08, 2024: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 04, 2024: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.