U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00294-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BORDERS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 15, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 07, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 07, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
January, 2025
  • January 07, 2025: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 11, 2024: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 10, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.