U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00005-5
  • Case Name: USA v. AVILA, ET AL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit]
  • April 04, 2025: [Case Referred for Screening]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence 2255]
  • April 04, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appeal Transcript]
January, 2025
  • January 05, 2025: [Appeal Transcript]
December, 2024
  • December 22, 2024: [Appeal Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Motions No Longer Submitted]
  • October 04, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.