U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00298-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRAHAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 11, 2025: [SEALED Exhibits]
  • April 08, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 02, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • April 01, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 09, 2024: [Waiver-Other]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • October 07, 2024: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 07, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Oral Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2024: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.