U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TOLSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 31, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sentencing]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 07, 2024: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • October 07, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2024: [Oral Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.