U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00297-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WALL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice-Other]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 18, 2025: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 26, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 26, 2025: [SEALED Position Paper Re Sentencing Factors - NOTICE TO THE COURT AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 18, 2025: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • March 13, 2025: [SEALED Draft Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 10, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • October 04, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.