U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00357-13
  • Case Name: USA v. AGUILAR-RIOS, ET AL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Continuing Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 12, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • March 12, 2025: [Judgment]
November, 2024
  • November 12, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • November 07, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
October, 2024
  • October 30, 2024: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 10, 2024: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 10, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 09, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 08, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Defendant Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 07, 2024: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • October 07, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.