U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00156-2
  • Case Name: USA v. MOSES et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 27, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Oral Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 07, 2024: [SEALED Response to Draft PSR - NOTICE TO PROBATION AND OPPOSING COUNSEL ONLY]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 04, 2024: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Revised]
  • October 04, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.