U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cauthen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 10, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Factual Basis]
  • October 09, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.