U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00095-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Case Number - USCA]
  • May 09, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • April 04, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Letter]
November, 2024
  • November 02, 2024: [Continue Other]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.